CA AB2302 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 943, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 801.6 of the Penal Code, relating to mandated reporters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse: sexual assault: mandated reporters: statute of limitations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2302 BAKER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2302 Baker et al. By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2302 BAKER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 943, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6621.).
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5513.).
2018-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-09SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-19SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4783.)
2018-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-04-10AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code11166Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code801.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback