CA AB2300 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11320.3 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 11320.31, 11451.5, and 11454.5 of, and to add Section 18929 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
CalWORKs and CalFresh: work requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2300 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2300 Kalra By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2300 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2300 Kalra By Skinner (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2300 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 588, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 5140.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 6. Page 4980.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11320.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11320.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11451.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11454.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |