CA AB2300 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11362.79 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to medical marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2300 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateDied on Senate inactive file.
2016-08-30SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
2016-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-19SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2016-06-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-06-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2016-06-21SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2016-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2016-05-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-05-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4679.)
2016-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-04-28AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2016-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2016-03-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2016-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2016-03-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2016-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2016-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11362.79Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2300&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2300_bill_20160218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2300_bill_20160318_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2300_bill_20160428_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2300_bill_20160819_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2300_vote_20160426_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2300_vote_20160505_0958AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_2251-2300/ab_2300_vote_20160628_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback