CA AB2299 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14029.93 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: managed care plans: informational materials.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2299 CHU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2299 Chu By Pan (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2299 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2299 Chu By Pan (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2299 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-19 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6633.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5591.). |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 5377.) |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5253.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 17). |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14029.93 | New Code | See Bill Text |