CA AB2290 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 60605.5 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: world languages: revision of content standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2290 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2290 Santiago By Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2290 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2290 Santiago By Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Assembly - AB 2290 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6448.). |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5312.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 3. Page 5104.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60605.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 60605.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |