CA AB229 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 770, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 19822.4 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employees: travel reimbursement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 229 CHANG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB229 Chang By Glazer (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 229 CHANG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 770, Statutes of 2015.
2015-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-23AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2015-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 3134.).
2015-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2015-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2690.).
2015-09-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-31SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-24SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-08-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-08-17SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-07-16SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 14). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2015-06-04SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2015-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1561.)
2015-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-05-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
2015-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2015-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
2015-02-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code19822.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65401Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_229&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_bill_20150204_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_bill_20150326_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_bill_20150422_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_bill_20150707_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_bill_20150716_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_bill_20150818_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_bill_20150831_amended_sen_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_bill_20150916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_bill_20151011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_vote_20150429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_vote_20150513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_vote_20150522_1037AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_vote_20150910_0449PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_229_vote_20150911_0203PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback