CA AB2289 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 942, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 48205 and 48980 of, and to add Sections 221.51, 222.5, and 46015 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil rights: pregnant and parenting pupils.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2289 WEBER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2289 Weber et al. By Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2289 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 942, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 7014.).
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5983.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-06-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5413.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code221.51New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code222.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code46015New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code48205Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48206.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48208Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code48980Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback