CA AB2289 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - Referred to Com. on T. & H.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-24 - Referred to Com. on T. & H.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4750.1 of, and to add Section 4750.2 to, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: specially constructed vehicles: emission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2289 JEFFRIES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4786.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). | |
2012-04-12 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-04-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44017.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4750.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4750.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |