CA AB2282 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 361.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Family reunification services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2282 McKinnor Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUMAN S. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 7.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 16). |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |