CA AB228 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 696, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1739.7 of the Civil Code, relating to collectibles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collectibles: sale of autographed memorabilia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 228 Gloria Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB228 Gloria et al. By Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AB 228 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 696, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3312.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2784.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-21SenateOrdered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2017-07-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 18).
2017-07-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-06-27SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-20SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2017-05-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1710.)
2017-05-22AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1653.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2017-05-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2017-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-21AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-02-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
2017-01-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
2017-01-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1739.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback