CA AB228 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11780.5 of the Insurance Code, relating to the State Compensation Insurance Fund.
Title
State Compensation Insurance Fund: out-of-state risks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Assembly - AB 228 FUENTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB228 Fuentes By Calderon (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - AB 228 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB228 Fuentes By Calderon (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Assembly - AB 228 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 670, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-09-09 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3180.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (September 9). Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3233.). | |
2011-09-02 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |
2011-09-01 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-31 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2190.). | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6). | |
2011-06-28 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-06-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-06-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |
2011-06-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-06-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-05-19 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-05-09 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-09 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1277.) | |
2011-04-04 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 30). | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-02-03 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 11780.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 11873 | Amended Code | Citation Text |