CA AB2279 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 595, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 595, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11011.24 to the Government Code, relating to state property, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Surplus state property: County of Napa.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-17 - Assembly - AB 2279 EVANS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2279 Evans By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 2279 EVANS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2279 Evans By Wolk (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - Assembly - AB 2279 EVANS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 595, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-27 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:20 p.m. | |
2010-08-17 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6285.) | |
2010-08-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4499.) | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (August 2). | |
2010-07-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-23 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-05-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 5035.) | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 28). | |
2010-04-13 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 13). | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |