CA AB2278 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2830 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Local Government Renewable Energy Self-Generation Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 18). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |