CA AB2278 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 41326 of the Education Code, relating to school districts.
Title
School districts: state administrators: evaluations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-05 - Assembly - AB 2278 SWANSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB2278 Swanson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2278 SWANSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB2278 Swanson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Assembly - AB 2278 SWANSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 159, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:10 p.m. | |
2012-07-05 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5600.). | |
2012-07-02 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-07-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4224.). | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-06-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-03 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4677.) | |
2012-04-30 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 41326 | Amended Code | Citation Text |