CA AB2278 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-12 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-12 - Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17052.12 and 23609 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income and corporation tax credits: research and
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-05-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-05-10 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2010-05-03 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2010-04-19 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |