CA AB2277 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 117700 of, to amend and renumber Section 117671 of, and to add Section 117667 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 47600) to Part 7 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to home-generated pharmaceutical waste.
Title
Solid waste facilities: home-generated pharmaceutical waste: incineration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 117667 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 117700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 47600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2277 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2277 |