CA AB2276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4436.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4436.).
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 105285 of, and to add Section 105301 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 14197.08 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public health.
Title
Childhood lead poisoning: screening and prevention.
Sponsors
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2276 Reyes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2276 Reyes et al. By Leyva (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2276 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2276 Reyes et al. By Leyva (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 2276 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4436.). | |
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 216, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5363.). |
2020-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1). |
2020-07-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4758.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 105285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 105301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.08 | New Code | See Bill Text |