CA AB2274 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2605 to the Family Code, relating to division of community property.
Title
Division of community property: pet animals.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2274 Quirk By Jackson (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2274 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2274 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 820, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 5336.). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 4. Page 5203.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5094.) |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 3). |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 2605 | New Code | See Bill Text |