CA AB2274 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 391.1, 391.2, 391.3, and 391.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil procedure.
Title
Vexatious litigants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2274 LARA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2274 Lara By Vargas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2274 LARA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2274 Lara By Vargas (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2274 LARA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6110.). | |
2012-08-20 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4573.). | |
2012-07-06 | Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-05 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |
2012-06-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-05-31 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-21 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4918.) | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-15 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 391.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 391.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 391.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 391.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 391.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |