CA AB227 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.7 (commencing with Section 11340) to Chapter 2 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs: education incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 227 MAYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1892.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2017-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11340 | New Code | See Bill Text |