CA AB227 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51871.5 of the Education Code, relating to education.
Title
Education technology planning.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Asm. Wilmer Carter [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] |
Asm. Mike Eng [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Asm. Jose Solorio [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - AB 227 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Assembly - AB 227 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-25 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2011-08-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-30 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-25 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 1041.) | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 13). | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-06 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-05 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 30). | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-02-03 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51871.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |