CA AB2269 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51009 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: Labor History Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2269 Swanson By Lieu (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2269 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2269 SWANSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2012-08-13 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-08-13 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 4470.). | |
2012-06-14 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13). | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 20. Page 4891.) | |
2012-04-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 11). | |
2012-03-21 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-20 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |