CA AB2268 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-15 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 714, 3950, 3953, 4181, 4181.1, 4188, 4650, 4654, and 13005 of, to repeal Sections 4181.2, 4656, and 4657 of, and to repeal and add Sections 4651, 4652, 4653, and 4655 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to mammals.
Title
Game mammals: wild pig depredation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-15 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5219.) Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 13005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3950 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3953 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4181.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4181.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4188 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4650 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4651 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4652 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4653 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4654 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4655 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4656 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4657 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |