CA AB2265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jun 3 @ 4:00 pm in State Capitol, Assembly Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5891.5 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Services Act: use of funds for substance use disorder treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2020-02-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2020-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5891.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback