CA AB2264 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-02 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1872.5 and 1873 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance information.
Title
Insurance fraud: release of information: other unlawful
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-30 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1872.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 1873 | Amended Code | Citation Text |