CA AB2263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 234, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 234, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 18962 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to land use.
Title
Designated historical resource: conversion or adaptation: required parking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 2263 FRIEDMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2263 Friedman By Beall (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2263 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2263 Friedman By Beall (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2263 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 234, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6241.). |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 5237.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5379.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 23). |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 9). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 18962 | New Code | See Bill Text |