CA AB226 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 995 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance.
Title
Unemployment insurance: reporting requirements: status
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 226 SOLORIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 226 SOLORIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-09-09 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Kehoe. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1355.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-25 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-14 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-30 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-02-03 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | |
2011-02-02 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 995 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 995 | Amended Code | Citation Text |