CA AB2248 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 2.7 (commencing with Section 71108) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to water quality.
Title
Water quality: California-Mexico cross-border rivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2248 Eduardo Garcia et al By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2248 Eduardo Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2248 Eduardo Garcia et al By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2248 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2248 Eduardo Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2248 Eduardo Garcia et al By Hueso (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2248 Eduardo Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Water, Parks, and Wildlife] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-18 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5232.). |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4847.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P., & W. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71108 | New Code | See Bill Text |