CA AB2245 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 32000 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: prohibitions: exemptions: probation departments.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - AB 2245 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - AB 2245 COOPER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4148.) |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 32000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |