CA AB2242 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1740, 1741, 1747, 1750.1, 1750.3, 1750.5, and 1752.4 of, to add Sections 1747.5, 1748, 1748.6, 1749.2, 1749.3, 1749.4, 1750.35, 1753.1, 1753.2, 1753.3, 1754, 1754.5, and 1755 to, to repeal Sections 1749.1, 1750, 1751, 1752.1, 1752.6, 1753, 1753.5, 1753.55, 1753.6, and 1753.7 of, and to repeal and add Sections 1750.2 and 1750.4 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Dentistry: dental assistants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |