CA AB2239 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 143, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 143, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 29805 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.
Title
Firearms: prohibited persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - AB 2239 Maienschein Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2239 Maienschein By Durazo (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2239 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2239 Maienschein By Durazo (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2239 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 143, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.). |
2022-06-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4433.). |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2022-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4983.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |