CA AB2239 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 51225.37 to the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: world language courses: A–G course certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 2239 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2239 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2239 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2239 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2239 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6201.). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5039.). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4828.) |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51225.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |