CA AB2239 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 170.1 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 56100.1, 82036.5, 83124, 84101, 84103, 84108, 84203.3, 84203.5, 84204, 84204.5, 84215, 84216, 84218, 84300, 84308, 84602, 84604, 84605, 84609, 85304, 85304.5, 85306, 85310, 85315, 85316, 85501, 89510, 89511.5, 89512.5, 89513, and 90002 of, to repeal Sections 84200.5, 84200.6, 84200.7, 84200.8, 84200.9, 84202.3, 84202.5, 84202.7, 84203, 84205, 84206, 84209, 84211, 84216.5, 84220, 84302, 85300, 85301, 85302, 85303, 85305, 85307, 85309, 85314, 85320, 85321, 85701, 85702, and 85704 of, to repeal Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 84250) of Chapter 4 of Title 9 of, and to repeal and add Section 84200 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Norby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2012-03-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |