CA AB2234 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2827 and 2827.8 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity net energy metering.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] |
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-19 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-16 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |