CA AB223 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2024 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to wildlife.
Title
Wildlife: dudleya: taking and possession.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 223 Ward Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB223 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 223 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB223 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 223 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2841.). |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2388.). |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1719.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1751.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2024 | New Code | See Bill Text |