CA AB223 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 55.54 of the Civil Code, relating to disability access.
Title
Civil actions: disabled access.
Sponsors
Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. K H Achadjian [R] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Asm. Diane Harkey [R] |
Asm. Brian Nestande [R] | Asm. Donald Wagner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. GOV. |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 55.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_223&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_223_bill_20130204_introduced.html |