CA AB223 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 119300) of Part 15 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to body art.
Title
Safe Body Art Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Elaine Alquist [D] | Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Wilmer Carter [D] | Asm. Mike Davis [D] |
Asm. Fiona Ma [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-26 - Assembly - AB 223 MA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB223 Ma By Price (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 223 MA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB223 Ma By Price (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 223 MA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2010-08-26 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 6731.) | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4844.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2010-06-15 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-14 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2010-05-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-01-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3912.) | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 21). | |
2010-01-13 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 12). | |
2010-01-07 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7). | |
2010-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2009-04-22 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 1). | |
2009-03-26 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-03-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-02-05 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. | |
2009-02-04 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 119300 | New Code | See Bill Text |