CA AB2227 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11713.1 and 24014 of the Vehicle Code, relating to motorcycles.
Title
Motorcycles: hang tags.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2227 Friedman By Moorlach (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2227 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 2227 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5232.). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 4826.) |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11713.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 24014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |