CA AB2227 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14601.4 and 23573 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: license suspension and revocation: punishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 14601.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14607.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14607.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23573 | Amended Code | Citation Text |