CA AB2226 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1202.4 of the Penal Code, relating to victims of crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime victims: restitution and compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2226 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2226 PATTERSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5623.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-04-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-09AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2018-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13957Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1202.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback