CA AB2225 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 9.5 (commencing with Section 9980) to the Public Resources Code, relating to resource conservation.
Title
Resource conservation: Native American tribes: traditional ecological knowledge: policy: conservation and management of lands.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] | Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2225 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4978.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 9980 | New Code | See Bill Text |