CA AB2219 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 17053.4 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Personal income tax: credit: home security surveillance.
Sponsors
Asm. Greg Wallis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |