CA AB2219 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 681, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9031 and 9115 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiative and referendum petitions: verification of signatures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2219 FONG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2219 Fong By Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Assembly - AB 2219 FONG Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 681, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2014-08-28AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2014-08-18AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6103.).
2014-08-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4464.).
2014-08-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-11SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-07-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-06-30SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2014-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-05-28SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2014-05-15SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2014-05-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4706.)
2014-04-21AssemblyFrom consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
2014-04-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2014-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2014-02-21AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2014-02-20AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code9031Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9115Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2219&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_bill_20140220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_bill_20140811_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_bill_20140820_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_bill_20140927_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_vote_20140401_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_vote_20140409_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_vote_20140501_0925AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_vote_20140617_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_vote_20140813_0414PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2201-2250/ab_2219_vote_20140818_0134PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback