CA AB2218 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.9 (commencing with Section 24540) to Division 20 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to consumer safety.
Title
Consumer safety: table saws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2218 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2218 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton. | |
2012-08-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 3). | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 4. Page 4817.) | |
2012-05-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-03 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 24540 | New Code | See Bill Text |