CA AB2217 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-23 - Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-23 - Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1400 of, and to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 1410) to Part 4 of Division 2 of, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Call centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-18 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1410 | New Code | See Bill Text |