CA AB2211 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


An act to add Sections 12812.7 and 12812.8 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 25244.17.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


California Green Business Program and Green Assistance Program.



2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2018-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12812.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code12812.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code25244.17.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

Bill Comments