CA AB2209 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 361.2, 366, and 16010.6 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: dependent children: placement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB2209 Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2209 HUESO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2209 HUESO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 144, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:20 p.m. | |
2012-07-02 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-07-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4226.). | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4786.) | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-24 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-17 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-16 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10). | |
2012-03-28 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16010.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366 | Amended Code | Citation Text |