CA AB220 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 89513 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign funds: childcare costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 220 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB220 Bonta et al. By Skinner (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 220 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB220 Bonta et al. By Skinner (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 220 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 3395.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2727.). |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2011.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 89513 | Amended Code | Citation Text |