CA AB220 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51224.5 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: mathematics: algebra.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #4 AB220 Holden (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 220 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Assembly - AB 220 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1793.). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2015-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1108.) |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51224.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |