CA AB2199 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 2.1 (commencing with Section 123450) of Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 106 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to doula care.
Title
Birthing Justice for California Families Pilot Project.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2199 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2199 Wicks et al. By Kamlager (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2199 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2199 Wicks et al. By Kamlager (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2199 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-25 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5217.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 4930.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4736.) |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 123450 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |